Report of Foreign Issuer Pursuant to Rule 13a-16 or 15d-16 (6-k)
December 01 2022 - 9:01AM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE
COMMISSION
Washington, D.C. 20549
FORM 6-K
REPORT OF FOREIGN PRIVATE
ISSUER
PURSUANT TO RULE 13a-16
OR 15d-16 UNDER
THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE
ACT OF 1934
For
the month of December 2022
ANTELOPE ENTERPRISE
HOLDINGS LTD.
(Translation of registrant's
name into English)
c/o Jinjiang Hengda
Ceramics Co., Ltd.
Junbing Industrial
Zone, Anhai, Jinjiang City, Fujian Province, PRC
Telephone +86 (595)
8576 5053
(Address of Principal
Executive Office)
Indicate by check mark whether the registrant
files or will file annual reports under cover of Form 20-F or Form 40-F.
Form 20-F
x Form 40-F
¨
Indicate
by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form 6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(1): ¨
Indicate
by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form 6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(7): ¨
Departure of Certain Officer and Directors
On November 15, 2022, Mr. Roy Tan Choon Kang,
a director of Antelope Enterprise Holdings Limited, a British Virgin Islands exempted limited company (the “Company”), resigned
from his position as a member of the board of directors (the “Board”), a member of the nominating and corporate governance
committee, a member of the compensation committee and the chairperson of the audit committee, effective on December 1, 2022. His resignation
was not a result of any disagreements with the Company on any matter related to the operations, policies, or practices of the Company.
In connection with Mr. Tan’s resignation, Mr. Dian Zhang, a member
of the Board, will become the chairperson of the Company’s audit committee, effective on December 1, 2022.
Appointment of Certain Officer and Directors
On November 30, 2022, the Board appointed Mr. Ishak Han, as a new member
of the Board, as well as a member of the audit committee, the nominating and corporate governance committee, and the compensation committee,
effective on December 1, 2022.
Mr. Ishak Han is the General Manager of Shenzhen
Baisifu Industrial Co., Ltd., which engages in property management and leasing, management services for catering businesses, and enterprise
management consulting. Having founded the firm in 2017, Mr. Han developed Shenzhen Baisifu Industrial Co., Ltd.’s marketing strategy,
management policies, financial budgeting, and corporate planning activities. From 2011 to 2016, Mr. Han was the General Manager of Shenzhen
Baisi Technology Co., Ltd. which engages in the development of self-service website application systems, the training and development
of online ventures, online marketing training, and e-commerce product consignments. As the founder of Shenzhen Baisi Technology Co., Ltd.,
Mr. Han oversaw its financial budgeting and corporate planning functions, and was responsible for its overall marketing strategy. Mr.
Han graduated with a higher degree diploma in marketing from Guangdong Open University in 2021.
Mr.
Han shall receive RMB10,000 quarterly compensation during his term. Mr. Han does not
have a family relationship with any other director or officer of the Company as defined in Item 401 of Regulation S-K.
A copy of the offer letter of Mr. Han is attached hereto as exhibit
10.1.
SUBMITTED HEREWITH
Exhibits:
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities
Exchange Act of 1934, the Registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned, hereunto duly authorized.
|
ANTELOPE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS LTD. |
|
|
|
|
By: |
/s/ Hen Man Edmund |
|
|
Hen Man Edmund, |
|
|
Chief Financial Officer |
Date: December 1, 2022
Antelope Enterprise (NASDAQ:AEHL)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2024 to Oct 2024
Antelope Enterprise (NASDAQ:AEHL)
Historical Stock Chart
From Oct 2023 to Oct 2024