Amended Statement of Ownership (sc 13g/a)
February 10 2021 - 6:36AM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
WASHINGTON, DC 20549
SCHEDULE 13G
Under the Securities Exchange Act of
1934
(Amendment No. 4) *
Aeglea BioTherapeutics, Inc.
(Name of Issuer)
Common Stock
(Title of Class of Securities)
00773J103
(CUSIP Number)
December 31, 2020
(Date of Event Which Requires Filing of
this Statement)
Check the appropriate box to designate the rule pursuant
to which this Schedule is filed:
* The remainder of this cover page shall be filled out
for a reporting person's initial filing on this form with respect to the subject class of securities, and for any subsequent amendment
containing information which would alter the disclosures provided in a prior cover page.
The information required in the remainder of this cover page shall
not be deemed to be “filed” for the purpose of Section 18 of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (“Act”)
or otherwise subject to the liabilities of that section of the Act but shall be subject to all other provisions of the Act (however,
see the Notes).
CUSIP 00773J103
|
Page 2 of 9
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1.
|
|
Names of Reporting Persons
LV Management Group, LLC
|
2.
|
|
Check the Appropriate Box if a Member of a Group (see instructions)
(a) ¨
(b) x
(1)
|
3.
|
|
SEC
USE ONLY
|
4.
|
|
Citizenship or Place of
Organization
Delaware
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Number of
Shares
Beneficially
Owned by
Each
Reporting
Person With:
|
|
5.
|
|
Sole Voting Power
0
|
|
6.
|
|
Shared Voting Power
0 (2)
|
|
7.
|
|
Sole Dispositive Power
0
|
|
8.
|
|
Shared Dispositive Power
0 (2)
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
9.
|
|
Aggregate Amount Beneficially Owned by Each Reporting Person
0
|
10.
|
|
Check
if the Aggregate Amount in Row (9) Excludes Certain Shares (see instructions) ¨
|
11.
|
|
Percent of Class Represented by Amount in Row 9
0% (3)
|
12.
|
|
Type of Reporting Person (see instructions)
OO
|
(1)
|
LV Management Group, LLC (“LV Management”), S. Edward Torres, Steven E. Hall, Ph.D. and Armen B. Shanafelt, Ph.D. (collectively, the “Reporting Persons”) may be considered members of a group for purposes of this Schedule 13G.
|
(2)
|
As described in Item 4 below, during the year ended December 31, 2020, LV Management ceased serving as the management company for Lilly Ventures Fund I, LLC (“LV”) and, as a result, no longer is considered to beneficially own the shares held by LV.
|
(3)
|
This percentage is calculated based upon 47,937,107 outstanding shares of Common Stock of the Issuer as of November 2, 2020, as reported in the Issuer’s Quarterly Report on Form 10-Q for the quarter ended September 30, 2020 as filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission on November 5, 2020.
|
CUSIP 00773J103
|
Page 3 of 9
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1.
|
|
Names of Reporting Persons
S. Edward Torres
|
2.
|
|
Check the Appropriate Box if a Member of a Group (see instructions)
(a) ¨
(b) x
(1)
|
3.
|
|
SEC
USE ONLY
|
4.
|
|
Citizenship or Place of
Organization
United States
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Number of
Shares
Beneficially
Owned by
Each
Reporting
Person With:
|
|
5.
|
|
Sole Voting Power
0
|
|
6.
|
|
Shared Voting Power
0 (2)
|
|
7.
|
|
Sole Dispositive Power
0
|
|
8.
|
|
Shared Dispositive Power
0 (2)
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
9.
|
|
Aggregate Amount Beneficially Owned by Each Reporting Person
0
|
10.
|
|
Check
if the Aggregate Amount in Row (9) Excludes Certain Shares (see instructions) ¨
|
11.
|
|
Percent of Class Represented by Amount in Row 9
0% (3)
|
12.
|
|
Type of Reporting Person (see instructions)
IN
|
(1)
|
LV Management Group, LLC (“LV Management”), S. Edward Torres, Steven E. Hall, Ph.D. and Armen B. Shanafelt, Ph.D. (collectively, the “Reporting Persons”) may be considered members of a group for purposes of this Schedule 13G.
|
(2)
|
As described in Item 4 below, during the year ended December 31, 2020, LV Management ceased serving as the management company for Lilly Ventures Fund I, LLC (“LV”) and, as a result, no longer is considered to beneficially own the shares held by LV.
|
(3)
|
This percentage is calculated based upon 47,937,107 outstanding shares of Common Stock of the Issuer as of November 2, 2020, as reported in the Issuer’s Quarterly Report on Form 10-Q for the quarter ended September 30, 2020 as filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission on November 5, 2020.
|
CUSIP 00773J103
|
Page 4 of 9
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1.
|
|
Names of Reporting Persons
Steven E. Hall, Ph.D.
|
2.
|
|
Check the Appropriate Box if a Member of a Group (see instructions)
(a) ¨
(b) x
(1)
|
3.
|
|
SEC
USE ONLY
|
4.
|
|
Citizenship or Place of
Organization
United States
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Number of
Shares
Beneficially
Owned by
Each
Reporting
Person With:
|
|
5.
|
|
Sole Voting Power
0
|
|
6.
|
|
Shared Voting Power
0 (2)
|
|
7.
|
|
Sole Dispositive Power
0
|
|
8.
|
|
Shared Dispositive Power
0 (2)
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
9.
|
|
Aggregate Amount Beneficially Owned by Each Reporting Person
0
|
10.
|
|
Check
if the Aggregate Amount in Row (9) Excludes Certain Shares (see instructions) ¨
|
11.
|
|
Percent of Class Represented by Amount in Row 9
0% (3)
|
12.
|
|
Type of Reporting Person (see instructions)
IN
|
(1)
|
LV Management Group, LLC (“LV Management”), S. Edward Torres, Steven E. Hall, Ph.D. and Armen B. Shanafelt, Ph.D. (collectively, the “Reporting Persons”) may be considered members of a group for purposes of this Schedule 13G.
|
(2)
|
As described in Item 4 below, during the year ended December 31, 2020, LV Management ceased serving as the management company for Lilly Ventures Fund I, LLC (“LV”) and, as a result, no longer is considered to beneficially own the shares held by LV.
|
(3)
|
This percentage is calculated based upon 47,937,107 outstanding shares of Common Stock of the Issuer as of November 2, 2020, as reported in the Issuer’s Quarterly Report on Form 10-Q for the quarter ended September 30, 2020 as filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission on November 5, 2020.
|
CUSIP 00773J103
|
Page 5 of 9
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1.
|
|
Names of Reporting Persons
Armen B. Shanafelt, Ph.D.
|
2.
|
|
Check the Appropriate Box if a Member of a Group (see instructions)
(a) ¨
(b) x
(1)
|
3.
|
|
SEC
USE ONLY
|
4.
|
|
Citizenship or Place of
Organization
United States
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Number of
Shares
Beneficially
Owned by
Each
Reporting
Person With:
|
|
5.
|
|
Sole Voting Power
103,533 (2)
|
|
6.
|
|
Shared Voting Power
0 (2)
|
|
7.
|
|
Sole Dispositive Power
103,533 (2)
|
|
8.
|
|
Shared Dispositive Power
0 (2)
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
9.
|
|
Aggregate Amount Beneficially Owned by Each Reporting Person
103,533
|
10.
|
|
Check
if the Aggregate Amount in Row (9) Excludes Certain Shares (see instructions) ¨
|
11.
|
|
Percent of Class Represented by Amount in Row 9
0.2% (3)
|
12.
|
|
Type of Reporting Person (see instructions)
IN
|
(1)
|
LV Management Group, LLC (“LV Management”), S. Edward Torres, Steven E. Hall, Ph.D. and Armen B. Shanafelt, Ph.D. (collectively, the “Reporting Persons”) may be considered members of a group for purposes of this Schedule 13G.
|
(2)
|
As described in Item 4 below, during the year ended December 31, 2020, LV Management ceased serving as the management company for Lilly Ventures Fund I, LLC (“LV”) and, as a result, no longer is considered to beneficially own the shares held by LV. Dr. Shanafelt has voting and dispositive authority over 103,533 shares issuable upon exercise of options held by Dr. Shanafelt that are exercisable within 60 days of December 31, 2020.
|
(3)
|
This percentage is calculated based upon 47,937,107 outstanding shares of Common Stock of the Issuer as of November 2, 2020, as reported in the Issuer’s Quarterly Report on Form 10-Q for the quarter ended September 30, 2020 as filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission on November 5, 2020.
|
CUSIP 00773J103
|
Page 6 of 9
|
Item 1(a).
|
Name of Issuer: Aeglea BioTherapeutics, Inc.
|
Item 1(b).
|
Address of Issuer’s Principal Executive Offices:
|
|
901 S. MoPac Expressway
|
|
Barton Oaks Plaza One
|
|
Suite 250
|
|
Austin, TX 78746
|
Item 2(a).
|
Name of Person Filing:
|
|
(i)
|
LV Management Group, LLC
|
|
(ii)
|
S. Edward Torres
|
|
(iii)
|
Steven E. Hall, Ph.D.
|
|
(iv)
|
Armen B. Shanafelt, Ph.D.
|
Item 2(b).
|
Address of Principal Business
Office or, if none, Residence: The address and principal business office of the Reporting Person is:
|
|
c/o LV Management Group, LLC
|
|
333 N. Alabama Street, Suite 350
|
|
Indianapolis, Indiana 46204
|
(i)
|
LV Management Group, LLC
|
Delaware limited liability company
|
(ii)
|
S. Edward Torres
|
United States citizen
|
(iii)
|
Steven E. Hall, Ph.D.
|
United States citizen
|
(iv)
|
Armen B. Shanafelt, Ph.D.
|
United States citizen
|
Item 2(d).
|
Title of Class of Securities: Common Stock
|
Item 2(e).
|
CUSIP Number: 00773J103
|
Item 3.
|
If this statement is filed pursuant to §§240.13d-1(b), or 240.13d-2(b) or (c), check whether the person filing is a:
|
Not applicable.
The following information with respect
to the beneficial ownership of the Common Stock by the Reporting Persons filing this statement on Schedule 13G is provided as of
December 31, 2020:
|
|
Number of Shares
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Held
|
|
|
Power to Vote or
Direct the Vote
|
|
|
Power to Dispose or
Direct
the Disposition
|
|
|
Beneficially
|
|
|
Beneficial
Ownership
Percentage
|
|
Reporting Person
|
|
Directly
|
|
|
Sole
|
|
|
Shared (1)
|
|
|
Sole
|
|
|
Shared (1)
|
|
|
Owned
|
|
|
(2)
|
|
LV Management Group, LLC
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
%
|
S. Edward Torres
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
%
|
Steven E. Hall, Ph.D.
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
0
|
%
|
Armen B. Shanafelt, Ph.D.
|
|
|
103,533
|
|
|
|
103,533
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
103,533
|
|
|
|
0
|
|
|
|
103,533
|
|
|
|
0.2
|
%
|
CUSIP 00773J103
|
Page 7 of 9
|
(1)
|
During the year ended December 31, 2020, LV Management ceased serving as the management company for Lilly Ventures Fund I, LLC (“LV”) and, as a result, no longer is considered to beneficially own the shares held by LV (as previously reported). Dr. Shanafelt has voting and dispositive authority over 103,533 shares issuable upon exercise of options held by Dr. Shanafelt that are exercisable within 60 days of December 31, 2020.
|
(2)
|
This percentage is calculated based upon 47,937,107 outstanding
shares of Common Stock of the Issuer as of November 2, 2020, as reported in the Issuer’s Quarterly Report on Form 10-Q
for the quarter ended September 30, 2020 as filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission on November 5, 2020.
|
Item 5.
|
Ownership of 5 Percent or Less of a Class
|
If
this statement is being filed to report the fact that as of the date hereof the reporting person has ceased to be the beneficial
owner of more than 5 percent of the class of securities, check the following x.
Item 6.
|
Ownership of More than 5 Percent on Behalf of Another Person
|
Not applicable.
Item 7.
|
Identification and Classification of the Subsidiary Which Acquired the Security Being Reported on By the Parent Holding Company or Control Person.
|
Not applicable.
Item 8.
|
Identification and Classification of Members of the Group
|
Not applicable.
Item 9.
|
Notice of Dissolution of a Group
|
Not applicable.
Not applicable.
CUSIP 00773J103
|
Page 8 of 9
|
SIGNATURES
After reasonable inquiry and to the best of my knowledge and
belief, I certify that the information set forth in this statement is true, complete and correct.
Dated: February 10, 2021
|
|
|
|
|
LV MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC
|
|
|
|
|
By:
|
/s/ S. Edward Torres
|
|
Name:
|
S. Edward Torres
|
|
Title:
|
Managing Director
|
|
|
|
|
/s/ S. Edward Torres
|
|
S. EDWARD TORRES
|
|
|
|
/s/ Steven E. Hall, Ph.D.
|
|
STEVEN E. HALL PH.D
|
|
|
|
/s/ Armen B. Shanafelt, Ph.D.
|
|
ARMEN B. SHANAFELT, PH.D
|
|
CUSIP 00773J103
|
Page 9 of 9
|
EXHIBIT A
JOINT FILING AGREEMENT
Pursuant to Rule 13d-1(k)(1) promulgated
pursuant to the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended, the undersigned agree that the attached Schedule 13G is being filed
on behalf of each of the undersigned.
Dated: February 10, 2021
|
|
|
|
|
LV MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC
|
|
|
|
|
By:
|
/s/ S. Edward Torres
|
|
Name:
|
S. Edward Torres
|
|
Title:
|
Managing Director
|
|
|
|
|
/s/ S. Edward Torres
|
|
S. EDWARD TORRES
|
|
|
|
/s/ Steven E. Hall, Ph.D.
|
|
STEVEN E. HALL PH.D
|
|
|
|
/s/ Armen B. Shanafelt, Ph.D.
|
|
ARMEN B. SHANAFELT, PH.D
|
|
Aeglea BioTherapeutics (NASDAQ:AGLE)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Aeglea BioTherapeutics (NASDAQ:AGLE)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024