Current Report Filing (8-k)
June 14 2018 - 4:17PM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
WASHINGTON, D.C. 20549
FORM
8-K
CURRENT
REPORT
PURSUANT TO SECTION 13 OR 15(d)
OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934
Date of Report (Date of earliest event reported): June 14, 2018 (June 9, 2018)
ALLERGAN PLC
(Exact
Name of Registrant as Specified in Charter)
|
|
|
|
|
Ireland
|
|
001-36867
|
|
98-1114402
|
(State or Other Jurisdiction
of Incorporation)
|
|
(Commission
File Number)
|
|
(IRS Employer
Identification No.)
|
Clonshaugh Business and Technology Park
Coolock, Dublin, D17 E400, Ireland
(Address of Principal Executive Offices)
(862)
261-7000
(Registrants telephone number, including area code)
Check the appropriate box below if the Form
8-K
filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of
the r10egistrant under any of the following provisions (
see
General Instruction A.2. below):
☐
|
Written communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
|
☐
|
Soliciting material pursuant to Rule
14a-12
under the Exchange Act (17 CFR
240.14a-12)
|
☐
|
Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule
14d-2(b)
under the Exchange Act (17 CFR
240.14d-2(b))
|
☐
|
Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule
13e-4(c)
under the Exchange Act (17 CFR
240.13e-4(c)
|
Indicate by check mark whether the registrant is an emerging growth company as defined
in Rule 405 of the Securities Act of 1933 (§230.405 of this chapter) or Rule
12b-2
of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934
(§240.12b-2
of this chapter).
Emerging growth company ☐
If an emerging growth company,
indicate by check mark if the registrant has elected not to use the extended transition period for complying with any new or revised financial accounting standards provided pursuant to Section 13(a) of the Exchange Act. ☐
Item 5.02. Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain
Officers; Compensatory Arrangements of Certain Officers.
(b) Departure of a Director
On June 14, 2018, Allergan plc (the
Company
) announced that Mr. Patrick J. OSullivan has decided to retire from the
Companys board of directors (the
Board
). Mr. OSullivan currently serves on the Audit and Compliance Committee and the Quality and Innovation Committee. Mr. OSullivan informed the Board of his decision
to retire on June 9, 2018. Mr. OSullivans retirement will be effective on July 10, 2018. Mr. OSullivans decision to retire was not due to any disagreement with the Company on any matter relating to the
Companys operations, policies or practices.
(d) Election of a Director
On June 13, 2018, the Board elected Mr. Thomas C. Freyman as a director of the Company, effective immediately. The Company expects to name
Mr. Freyman to the Audit and Compliance Committee at the Boards meeting in October 2018. There are currently no arrangements pursuant to which Mr. Freyman was appointed to the Board.
Mr. Freyman retired from Abbott Laboratories (
Abbott
) in 2017. Most recently, he served as Executive Vice President, Finance and
Administration for Abbott since June 2015. Prior to that, he served as Chief Financial Officer and Executive Vice President, Finance for Abbott. He was first appointed Chief Financial Officer and Senior Vice President, Finance at Abbott in 2001.
Previously, he served as Vice President and Controller of Abbotts Hospital Products Division and held a number of financial planning and analysis positions. Prior to joining Abbott, Mr. Freyman was a certified public accountant at Ernst &
Whinney.
Mr. Freyman holds a bachelors degree in accounting from the University of Illinois and a masters degree in management from
Northwestern University. He also serves on the Board of Directors of Tenneco Inc. and Hanger, Inc., serving on the audit committee of each of those boards.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned
hereunto duly authorized.
|
|
|
|
|
Dated: June 14, 2018
|
|
Allergan plc
|
|
|
|
|
|
By:
|
|
/s/ A. Robert D. Bailey
|
|
|
|
|
A. Robert D. Bailey
|
|
|
|
|
Chief Legal Officer and Corporate Secretary
|
Allergan (NYSE:AGN)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Allergan (NYSE:AGN)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024