Report of Foreign Issuer (6-k)
March 06 2018 - 5:02PM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
WASHINGTON, DC 20549
FORM 6-K
REPORT OF FOREIGN PRIVATE ISSUER
PURSUANT TO RULE 13a-16 OR 15d-16 UNDER
THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934
For the month of March 2018
Commission File Number: 001-36885
TANTECH
HOLDINGS LTD.
Tantech Holdings Ltd.
No. 10 Chen Shan Road, Shuige Industrial
Zone
Lishui City, Zhejiang Province 323600
+86-578-226-2305
(Address of principal executive offices)
Indicate by check mark whether the registrant files or will
file annual reports under cover of Form 20-F or Form 40-F.
Form
20-F
x
Form
40-F
¨
Indicate
by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form 6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(1):
¨
Indicate
by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form 6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(7):
¨
Explanatory Note:
On March 6, 2018, Tantech Holdings Ltd. (the “Registrant”)
announced the appointment of a new Chief Operating Officer. The employment agreement for Jianming Wu expired on February 24, 2017,
and he continued to serve on an at-will basis after expiration through March 1, 2018, when he ceased to serve as Chief Operating
Officer. Mr. Wu’s departure was not due to any disagreement with management on any matter related to the Registrant’s
operations, policies or practices.
Effective March 1, 2018, Wangfeng Yan was appointed as the Registrant’s
new Chief Operating Officer. Mr. Yan joined Zhejiang Tantech Bamboo Technology Co., Ltd. (“Tantech Bamboo”) as a member
of the production staff in August 2010 and rose to serve as the head of production managers. Prior to being appointed as Chief
Operating Officer, Mr. Yan was in charge of production management for Tantech Bamboo and Zhejiang Tantech Energy Tech Co., Ltd.
(“Tantech Energy”). In these capacities, Mr. Yan contributed to the “Dr. Charcoal” brand sales channel
development. In June 2010, Mr. Yan earned a Bachelor’s Degree in Engineering from Zhejiang Sci-tech University in Hangzhou.
Effective March 1, 2018, Mr. Qingsong Dong
resigned as Treasurer of the Registrant. Mr. Dong’s departure was not due to any disagreement with management on any matter
related to the Registrant’s operations, policies or practices.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities and Exchange
Act of 1934, the Registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned thereunto duly authorized.
|
TANTECH HOLDINGS LTD.
|
|
|
|
By:
|
/s/ Zhengyu Wang
|
|
|
Name: Zhengyu Wang
Chief Executive Officer
(Principal Executive Officer) and
Duly Authorized Officer
|
Dated: March 6, 2018
Tantech (NASDAQ:TANH)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Tantech (NASDAQ:TANH)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024