Current Report Filing (8-k)
April 30 2019 - 4:30PM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND
EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington,
D.C. 20549
FORM 8-K
CURRENT REPORT
Pursuant to
Section 13 OR 15(d) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934
Date of Report
(Date of earliest event reported): April 26, 2019
Scivanta
Medical Corporation
(Exact name of registrant as specified in
its charter)
Nevada
|
|
000-27119
|
|
22-2436721
|
(state or other jurisdiction
of incorporation)
|
|
(Commission File Number)
|
|
(IRS Employer
Identification Number)
|
215 Morris Avenue, Spring Lake,
New Jersey 07762
(address of principal executive offices) (zip
code)
(732) 282-1620
(registrant’s telephone number, including
area code)
(former name or former address, if changed
since last report)
Check the
appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant under
any of the following provisions (see General Instruction A.2. below):
|
¨
|
Written
communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
|
|
¨
|
Soliciting
material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12)
|
|
¨
|
Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
|
|
¨
|
Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
|
Emerging growth company
x
If an emerging growth company, indicate by check mark if the
registrant has elected not to use the extended transition period for complying with any new or revised financial accounting standards
provided pursuant to Section 13(a) of the Exchange Act.
¨
Item 5.02 Departure
of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements of Certain
Officers
On
April 26, 2018, the Board of Directors of the registrant accepted the resignation of Thomas Gifford as President and a member
of the registrant’s Board of Directors and appointed Leonard Lovallo as President. Leonard Lovallo, 37, is Managing Member
of Millennial Investments, LLC, a consulting firm that he controls, through which he has, since 2014, assisted public and private
companies in the areas of mergers, acquisitions, debt restructuring, equity investments and corporate governance. Mr. Lovallo
graduated from the State University of New York (Buffalo) with a BA in psychology. In connection with his being appointed as President
of the registrant Mr. Lovallo is receiving 500,000 shares of the registrant’s common stock, an award of 1,000,000 shares
upon the registrant becoming current in its SEC filings and a salary of $2,000 per month.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant
to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf
by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
Date: April 30, 2019
|
Scivanta Medical Corporation
|
|
|
|
|
By:
|
/s/
Leonard Lovallo
|
|
|
Name: Leonard Lovallo
|
|
|
Title: President
|