Inspirations PLC - Re Directorate, etc
September 09 1997 - 8:09AM
UK Regulatory
RNS No 6548a
INSPIRATIONS PLC
9th September 1997
Inspirations plc ("the Company")
On 5 September 1997, the offer for the ordinary and
listed convertible share capital of the Company by
Carlson Leisure Group (UK) Limited was declared
unconditional in all respects. As a consequence all of
the directors of Inspirations plc, with the exception of
Paul Jackson, have resigned from the board of the Company
with effect from 8 September 1997.
The Company also wishes to announce that, with effect
from 8 September 1997, John Dignan, Michael Batt and
Malcolm Hewitt, who are representatives of Carlson
Leisure Group (UK) Limited, have been appointed as
directors of the Company.
On 8 September 1997, notices to purchase compulsorily the
minority ordinary and listed preference shareholdings in
the Company, pursuant to section 429 of the Companies
Act, were despatched by Carlson Leisure Group (UK)
Limited.
END
x
Inspicio (LSE:INP)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Inspicio (LSE:INP)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024