TIDMGILD
RNS Number : 0616E
Guild Esports PLC
08 March 2022
The information contained within this announcement is deemed by
the Company to constitute inside information stipulated under the
Market Abuse Regulation (EU) No. 596/2014, as retained as part of
the law of England and Wales. Upon the publication of this
announcement via the Regulatory Information Service, this inside
information is now considered to be in the public domain.
Press release
8 March 2022
Guild Esports PLC
('Guild Esports', 'Guild' or 'the Company')
Update on current trading
Board appointments
Notice of Annual General Meeting
Guild Esports (LSE: GILD; OTCQB: GULDF), a global teams
organisation and lifestyle brand, is pleased to announce that it
has continued to trade in line with management expectations since
reporting its results for the year ended 30 September 2021, on 31
January 2022.
The Company's new business pipeline remains strong and several
potentially significant sponsorship deals with tier 1 brands
continue to be at advanced stages of negotiations and are
progressing as expected. While there is no certainty when these
prospects may get signed, the Company remains confident of its new
business prospects for this year.
Guild's professional esports teams continue to perform well and
the Company most recently secured first place in the prestigious
Fortnite Champion Series ('FNCS') EU Final on 6 March 2022.
The following appointments are proposed to support the next
phase of the Company's growth and strengthen the technology and
capital markets experience at board level.
Board appointments
Approaching our second AGM post-Listing, the Board has
identified this time as an opportunity to re-focus the leadership
at Guild. Simon Walters, Chris Sullivan and Andrew Drake will step
down as non-executive directors at the close of this year's
AGM.
Resolutions will be proposed at the AGM to appoint Mike Edwards
and Brian Stockbridge as non-executive directors.
James Savage has resigned as the Company's executive finance
director, for personal reasons, with immediate effect. An interim
chief financial officer is due to start immediately and will attend
all upcoming board meetings. The Company has already commenced an
executive search for a permanent replacement and a further
announcement will be made in due course.
Should shareholders approve the relevant resolutions at the AGM,
the revised board will comprise executive director Kal Hourd, and
non-executive directors Derek Lew, Mike Edwards, Brian Stockbridge
and David Gardner.
Mike Edwards has over 20 years' leadership track record in
building consumer technology companies in private and public
markets. He has co-founded several successful companies, including:
AreaConnect.com, a consumer content company acquired by NASDAQ
listed Marchex; Wyley Interactive, a mobile game engagement
platform acquired by NASDAQ listed Zynga; Creative Labs, a start-up
foundry that builds consumer technology companies and Leaf Mobile,
a game studio listed on the TSX. Mr Edwards has also invested in
early stage consumer companies such as Punch'd (later acquired by
Google), Wander (later acquired by Yahoo), Summify (later acquired
by Twitter), BlueBat Games (later acquired by Novomatic Group),
Retsly (later acquired by Zillow) and Password Box (later acquired
by Intel). He is also a co-founder of: Argo Blockchain PLC, an
enterprise-scale provider of cryptocurrency mining services listed
on the London Stock Exchange; Pioneer Media Holdings Inc, an
investment company listed on the Canadian Stock Exchange and AQSE
focussing on mobile gaming and the metaverse; Cellular Goods Plc,
the first pure-play cannabinoid-based consumer brands company to
join the London Stock Exchange; and NFT Investments Plc, the first
publicly traded vehicle for the NFT asset class.
Brian Stockbridge has over 20 years' experience in corporate
finance, including direct investments and financing into companies,
IPOs, capital raisings and mergers and acquisitions for both public
and private companies. He is Chief Executive Officer of First
Sentinel Corporate Finance Limited. He has held board positions on
several public and private companies throughout his career, most
notably with Rangers Football Club and Allegiance Insurance. Brian
has also held director and management positions with Zeus Capital,
Allenby Capital, Noble & Company and Grant Thornton. He served
as a Regulator for the Panel on Takeovers and Mergers, where he
presided a significant number of transactions, including many
valued over GBP1bn.
Derek Lew, Non-Executive Chairman of Guild Esports, said: "I
would like to thank Simon, Andrew, Chris and James on behalf of the
entire Guild team for their counsel and contribution to the
Company. I would also like to welcome Mike and Brian who will bring
fresh and relevant boardroom oversight of Guild's growth strategy.
We have a solid executive management team under chief executive Kal
Hourd and excellent prospects. As a result, the Board looks to the
future with confidence."
Kal Hourd, Chief Executive of Guild Esports, said: "I am
delighted to welcome our new non-executive directors to Guild and
look forward with great anticipation to working with them closely
to deliver on the Company's potential and opportunities."
Notice of AGM
The Company will hold its AGM on 31 March 2022 at 9 a.m. at the
offices of Fladgate LLP, 16 Great Queen Street, London, WC2B
5DG.
Notice of the AGM, together with the Form of Proxy, has been
posted to shareholders today. The Notice of AGM will shortly also
be available on the Company's website www.guildesports.com .
Board Member Current Directorships Past Directorships
Candidate
Mike Edwards Motto Technologies PLC Creative Labs Management
Durban Holdings Ltd. (Canada) Inc. (Canada)
Leaf Mobile, Inc. (Canada) GrowLab Ventures Inc. (Canada)
Marallo Holdings, Inc. Launch Academy Inc. (Canada)
(Canada) Mobio Technologies Inc. (Canada)
Oak Mason Holdings Inc. Ronin Blockhain Corp. (Canada)
(Canada) National Angel Capital Association
Twenty Year Media Corp (Canada)
(Canada) Plank Ventures Limited (Canada)
8585466 Canada Corp (Canada) Argo Blockchain PLC
Clarify Pharma plc Googly eSports PLC
NFT Investments PLC
The Drops Esports Limited
AQRU PLC
Pioneer Media Holdings,
Inc. (Canada)
-------------------------------- ----------------------------------------
Brian Stockbridge First Sentinel Corporate Allegiance Insure Limited
Finance Limited - January 2015 - June 2021
Omni Egis plc Intergroup Mining PTY Ltd
First Sentinel Carry Limited (Australia) 2016 - May 2021
First Sentinel Advisory First Sentinel Investments
Limited First Sentinel Limited -March 2017 - October
Trustees Limited First 2020
Sentinel Wealth Limited ConnectX Capital Markets
Charlotte St Resources UK Ltd January 2019 - September
plc Anodyne Investments 2020 (never traded)
plc NQ Minerals plc - April 2015-November
New Leaf Capital Limited 2019
Maltbridge Consulting AC2NZ Limited - January 2018-
Limited June 2019 (never traded)
Art By Stella Limited Denali Research Limited -
International Financial November 2017-April 2019
Strategic Associates Limited (never traded)
Capable Finance Limited FS NEX Exchange Investment
First Sentinel Perennial Company Limited - August
Limited 2017-February 2019 (never
traded)
Class of 2015A Limited -
May 2014 - July 2017 (never
traded)
Financial Strategic Associates
Limited - February 2014 -
October 2020 (never traded)
Yumchaa Retail Limited -
December 2015 - September
2017
Yumchaa Group Limited - December
2015 - September 2017
Yumchaa Holdings plc - July
2014 - September 2017
Berwick Street Limited -
December 2015 - September
2017
-------------------------------- ----------------------------------------
For further information please contact:
Guild Esports
Kal Hourd via Tancredi +44 207 887
Chief Executive 7633
Neil Thapar
Investor Relations
+44 7876 455 323
-------------------------
Tennyson Securities
-------------------------
Corporate Broker
Peter Krens +44 207 186 9030
-------------------------
Zeus Capital
-------------------------
Corporate Broker
Benjamin Robertson +44 203 829 5000
-------------------------
Tancredi Intelligent Communication
Media Relations
-------------------------
Salamander Davoudi
Emma Valgimigli +44 7957 549 906
Helen Humphrey +44 7727 180 873
guild@tancredigroup.com +44 7449 226 720
-------------------------
About Guild Esports:
Guild Esports PLC is a global fan-focused team organisation and
lifestyle brand that fields professional players in gaming
competitions under the Guild banner. Our in-house training academy
aims to attract and nurture the best esports talent, and our goal
is to provide the ultimate entertainment experience alongside a
distinctive lifestyle brand authentic to the esports community
worldwide. Guild is led by an experienced management team of
esports veterans and co-owned by David Beckham. The Company is
headquartered in the UK and its shares are listed on the main
market of the London Stock Exchange (ticker: GILD) and on the OTCQB
Venture Market in the United States (ticker: GULDF). Please visit
www.guildesports.com for more information.
This information is provided by RNS, the news service of the
London Stock Exchange. RNS is approved by the Financial Conduct
Authority to act as a Primary Information Provider in the United
Kingdom. Terms and conditions relating to the use and distribution
of this information may apply. For further information, please
contact rns@lseg.com or visit www.rns.com.
RNS may use your IP address to confirm compliance with the terms
and conditions, to analyse how you engage with the information
contained in this communication, and to share such analysis on an
anonymised basis with others as part of our commercial services.
For further information about how RNS and the London Stock Exchange
use the personal data you provide us, please see our Privacy
Policy.
END
NOABSGDXSBGDGDI
(END) Dow Jones Newswires
March 08, 2022 09:16 ET (14:16 GMT)
Guild Esports (LSE:GILD)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Guild Esports (LSE:GILD)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024