Current Report Filing (8-k)
December 08 2017 - 2:46PM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED
STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington,
D.C. 20549
FORM
8-K
CURRENT
REPORT
Pursuant
to Section 13 or 15(d) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934
Date
of report (date of earliest event reported): December 7, 2017
KinerjaPay
Corp.
(Exact
Name of Registrant as Specified in its Charter)
Commission
File No.: 0-55081
Delaware
|
|
42-1771817
|
(State
of Incorporation)
|
|
(I.R.S.
Employer Identification No.)
|
|
|
|
Jl.
Multatuli, No.8A, Medan Indonesia
|
|
20151
|
(Address
of Registrant’s Office)
|
|
(ZIP
Code)
|
Registrant’s
Telephone Number, including area code: +62-819-6016-168
Check
the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant
under any of the following provisions (see General Instruction A.2. below):
[ ]
|
Written
communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
|
[ ]
|
Soliciting
material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12)
|
[ ]
|
Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
|
[ ]
|
Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
|
Item
5.02 Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements
of Certain Officers.
On
December 7, 2017, KinerjaPay Corp., (OTCQB: KPAY), a digital payment and eCommerce platform, (“KinerjaPay” or the
“Registrant”) announced the appointment of Mr. Windy Johan as Chief Financial Officer of the Registrant and its wholly-owned
Indonesian subsidiary, PT Kinerja Pay Indonesia (“KinerjaPay Indonesia”), effective on December 8, 2017. Prior to
the appointment of Mr. Johan, Mr. Meigisonnata Widjaja had previously served as CFO of the Registrant and KinerjaPay Indonesia
since March 16, 2017.
Mr.
Windy Johan, age 41, Chief Financial Officer:
Mr. Johan, a licensed Chartered Accountant since May 2014, has over 18 years
of professional experience in finance, tax, accounting, auditing and budgeting. From April 2014 to the present, Mr. Johan served
as Finance and Accounting Manager of PT Ancora International (Ancora Group),
an Indonesia-based
holding company engaged in mining, oil and gas and transportation. Mr. Johan’s responsibilities included supervision of
finance, accounting and tax matters for subsidiaries in the Ancora Group. From February 2013 through January 2014, Mr. Johan served
as Financial Controller at PT Loka Wisata Asri, an Indonesian real estate group with three hotels located in Bali, Bogor and Anyer,
Indonesia. Mr. Johan’s responsibilities included supervision of finance, accounting and tax matters and interaction with
the company’s banking, tax and audit firms, under the direction of the chief executive officer. From October 2007 through
January 2013, Mr. Johan served as Budget Controller Manager at PT Bormindo Nusantara, an Ancora Group subsidiary, with responsibilities
including project budgets, financial modeling and other financial matters. Mr. Johan began his accounting career at Prasetio Utomo
& Co., an affiliate of Arthur Andersen, Indonesia.
Mr.
Meigisonnata Widjaja stated in his letter of resignation, a copy of which is attached hereto, that he had no disagreements with
the operations, policies or practices of the Registrant or its wholly-subsidiary subsidiary, PT KinerjaPay Indonesia.
Item
9.01 Financial Statements and Exhibits
(b)
The following documents are filed as exhibits to this current report on Form 8-K or incorporated by reference herein. Any document
incorporated by reference is identified by a parenthetical reference to the SEC filing that included such document.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant
to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the Company has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf
by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
|
KinerjaPay Corp.
|
|
|
|
|
By:
|
/s/
Edwin Witarsa Ng
|
|
Name:
|
Edwin
Witarsa Ng
|
|
Title:
|
Chief
Executive Officer
|
Date:
December 8, 2017