Current Report Filing (8-k)
November 24 2021 - 5:05PM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
0001491487
false
999077
0001491487
2021-11-24
2021-11-24
iso4217:USD
xbrli:shares
iso4217:USD
xbrli:shares
UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington, D.C. 20549
FORM 8-K
CURRENT REPORT
Pursuant to Section 13 OR 15(d) of the
Securities Exchange Act of 1934
Date of Report (Date of earliest event reported):
November 24, 2021
TAKUNG ART CO., LTD
(Exact name of Registrant as specified in its
charter)
Delaware
|
|
001-38036
|
|
26-4731758
|
(State or other jurisdiction
of Incorporation)
|
|
(Commission
File No.)
|
|
(IRS Employer
Identification No.)
|
Room
709 Tower 2 , Admiralty Centre, 18 Harcourt Road, Admiralty, Hong Kong
(Address of Principal Executive Offices)
Registrant’s telephone number:
+852 3158
0977
________________________________________________
(Former name or former address, if changed since
last report)
Check the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended
to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant under any of the following provisions (see General Instruction
A.2. below):
¨
|
Written communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
|
¨
|
Soliciting material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12)
|
¨
|
Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
|
¨
|
Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
|
Securities registered pursuant to Section 12(b) of the Act:
Title of each class
|
Trading Symbol(s)
|
Name of each exchange on which registered
|
Common Stock, par value $0.001 per share
|
TKAT
|
NYSE American
|
Indicate by check mark whether the registrant is an emerging growth
company as defined in Rule 405 of the Securities Act of 1933 (§230.405 of this chapter) or Rule 12b-2 of the Securities Exchange
Act of 1934 (§240.12b-2 of this chapter).
Emerging growth company ¨
If an emerging growth company, indicate by check mark if the registrant
has elected not to use the extended transition period for complying with any new or revised financial accounting standards provided pursuant
to Section 13(a) of the Exchange Act. ¨
|
Item 5.02
|
Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements of
Certain Officers.
|
On November 24, 2021, the
Company appointed Mr. Tak Ching (Anthony) Poon as a member of the Board, to fill in the vacancy result from the resignation of the former
Board member as previously disclosed on our current report on Form 8-K filed on November 18, 2021. Mr. Poon shall be eligible for reelection
(along with the Company’s other directors) at the Company’s upcoming Annual Meeting of Shareholders.
In connection with their appointments
as directors to the Company, the Company and Mr. Poon signed an offer letter (the “Offer Letter”) on November 24, 2021.
Pursuant to this Offer Letter, Mr. Poon will receive an annual compensation of $40,000 in cash, payable quarterly in advance and be reimbursed
for reasonable expenses incurred in the performance of his duties. The foregoing description of the principal terms of the Offer Letter
is a general description only, does not purport to be complete, and is qualified in its entirety by reference to the terms of the Offer
Letter attached hereto as Exhibits 10.1, which is incorporated herein by this reference.
There is no family relationship
between Mr. Poon and any of our other officers and directors.
Biographical Information of the New Director.
Mr. Tak Ching (Anthony) Poon
Mr. Poon, age 39, has over
14 years of experience in the field of banking, accounting and corporate finance. He joined ALE Corporate Services Limited, a Hong
Kong company providing accounting and corporate consulting services to small and medium-sized businesses and served as its Chief Executive
Officer since April 2018. He is also the Chief Executive Officer and Chairman of ALE Group Holding Ltd., the parent company of ALE Corporate
Services Limited. Mr. Poon obtained his Bachelor’s degree in Business Administration from the Chinese University of Hong Kong in
December 2004, majoring in Professional Accountancy and admitted as a member of the Association of Chartered Certified Accountants. From
July 2004 to July 2016, he worked in the Hong Kong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited under commercial banking department managing
corporate relationship team in diverse industry sectors including Textile and Garment, Toys, Electronics and Printing, Property Developer
/ Non-bank Financial Institution and provide structured financing solution for their funding need. His last position was Senior Vice President
in Large Corporates department. In July 2019, Mr. Poon has appointed as an Independent Non-Executive Director of Precious Dragon Technology
Holdings Limited (HKEX 1861) being the Chairman for Audit Committee. We believe that Mr. Poon with years of experience in team building,
customer relationship handling, business operations, and enterprise management, is qualified to be our member of the board.
|
Item 9.01.
|
Financial Statements and Exhibits.
|
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements
of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned hereunto
duly authorized.
Date: November 24, 2021
|
|
Takung Art Co., Ltd
|
|
|
|
|
|
/s/ Kwok Leung Paul Li
|
|
|
Name: Kwok Leung Paul Li
|
|
|
Title: Chief Executive Officer
|
Takung Art (AMEX:TKAT)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Takung Art (AMEX:TKAT)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024