Report of Foreign Issuer (6-k)
January 03 2020 - 6:40AM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED
STATES
SECURITIES
AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
WASHINGTON,
D.C. 20549
FORM
6-K
REPORT
OF FOREIGN PRIVATE ISSUER
PURSUANT
TO RULE 13a-16 OR 15d-16
UNDER
THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934
For
the month of December 2019
Commission
File Number 333-209744
TODOS
MEDICAL LTD.
(Translation
of registrant’s name into English)
|
1
Hamada Street
Rehovot,
Israel 2244427
Tel:
(011) (972) 8-633-3964
|
|
(Address
of Principal Executive Offices)
Indicate by check mark whether the registrant files or will file annual reports under cover of Form 20-F or Form 40-F:
☒ Form
20-F ☐ Form 40-F
Indicate by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form 6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(1): ____
Indicate by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form 6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(7): ____
Departure
of Directors or Principal Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Principal Officers
Resignation
of David Ben Naim
On
December 30, 2019, Mr. David Ben Naim, the Company’s Chief Financial Officer, resigned from his position as CFO of the Company
for personal reasons. Mr. Ben Naim’s resignation was not the result of any disagreement with the Company relating to the
Company’s operations, policies, or practices.
Resignation
of Directors
On
December 30, 2019, Mr. Rami Zigdon resigned from the Board of Directors of the Company for personal reasons. Mr. Zigdon did not
serve on any committees of the Board of Directors. The resignation was not the result of any disagreement with the Company relating
to the Company’s operations, policies, or practices.
On
December 31, 2019, Mr. Alon Shalev and Ms. Ronit Even-Zahav Meitin, the Company’s external directors, resigned from the
Board of Directors of the Company due to the fact that the Company has not paid its external directors as a result of the Company’s
precarious financial situation and due to the CFO’s resignation the day before. Mr. Shalev and Ms. Even-Zahav Meitin served on
the Audit Committee and on the Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors. The resignations were not the result of any disagreement
with the Company relating to the Company’s operations, policies, or practices.
Signatures
Pursuant
to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf
by the undersigned, thereunto duly authorized.
|
TODOS MEDICAL LTD.
|
|
|
|
By:
|
/s/ Dr.
Herman Weiss
|
|
|
Name:
Dr. Herman Weiss
|
|
|
Title: Chief Executive Officer
|
Date:
January 3, 2020
2
Todos Med (CE) (USOTC:TOMDF)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Todos Med (CE) (USOTC:TOMDF)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024