Item 5.02, Departure of Directors or Principal Officers;
Election of Directors; Appointment of Principal Officer.
Appointment:
On March 23, 2021 David R. Koos was appointed Chairman
and Sole Director of Regen Biopharma, Inc. On March 23, 2021 David R. Koos was appointed Chief Executive Officer, President, Secretary
and Treasurer of Regen Biopharma, Inc.
On March 23, 2021 David R. Koos was appointed Chairman
and Sole Director of KCL Therapeutics, Inc. On March 23, 2021 David R. Koos was appointed Chief Executive Officer, President, Secretary
and Treasurer of KCL Therapeutics, Inc.
KCL Therapeutics, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of
Regen Biopharma, Inc.
Education:
DBA - Finance (December
2003)
Atlantic International
University
Ph.D. - Sociology
(September 2003)
Atlantic International
University
MA - Sociology (June
1983)
University of California
- Riverside, California
Five Year Employment
History:
David
R. Koos, 62 has served as Chairman of the Board of Directors, Chief Executive Officer, President, Secretary and Treasurer of SYBLEU
INC., a biotechnology company, from June 12, 2020 to the present. David R. Koos served as Chief Financial Officer of SYBLEU INC.
from June 12, 2020 to July 21, 2020. On March 23, 2021 David R. Koos assumed the position of sole officer and director of
Zander Therapeutics, Inc., a biotechnology company.
Position:
|
|
Company Name:
|
|
Employment Dates:
|
Chairman, President, Chief Executive Officer, Secretary, Acting Chief Financial Officer, Principal Accounting Officer
|
|
Entest Group, Inc.
|
|
June 19, 2009 to November 28, 2018
|
Chairman, President, Chief Executive Officer, Secretary, Chief Financial Officer, Principal Accounting Officer
|
|
Entest BioMedical, Inc.( a California corporation)
|
|
August 22,2008 to the Present
|
Chairman and CEO
|
|
Regen BioPharma, Inc.
|
|
April 24, 2012 to January 22,2020
|
Acting CFO
|
|
Regen BioPharma, Inc.
|
|
April 24, 2012 to February 11, 2015
|
President
|
|
Regen BioPharma, Inc.
|
|
May 29, 2013 to October 9, 2013
|
Chairman, CEO
|
|
Zander Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
February 2017 to January 22,2020
|
Sole Officer and Director
|
|
Cell Source Research, Inc.
|
|
March 24, 2003 to the Present
|
Chairman, President, CEO and Acting CFO
|
|
Bio-Matrix Scientific Group, Inc.
|
|
June 14, 2006 (Chairman) to July 31;2019 June 19, 2006 (President, CEO and Acting CFO); June 19, 2006 (Secretary) to July 31, 2019
|
Chairman & CEO
|
|
BST Partners Inc.
(A California Corporation)
|
|
November 30, 2018 to the Present
|
Chairman & CEO
|
|
BST Partners Inc.
(A Wyoming Corporation)
|
|
March 17, to 2017 to the Present
|
Related Party Transactions:
As of June 20, 2019 the registrant was indebted to David
R. Koos in the amount of $5,840
As of June 30, 2020 the registrant was indebted to Zander
Therapeutics, Inc. in the amount of $56,900.
As of June 30, 2019 Zander Therapeutics, Inc. was party
to an agreement with KCL Therapeutics, Inc. whereby Zander was granted an exclusive worldwide right and license for the development
and commercialization of certain intellectual property controlled by KCL (“ License IP”) for non-human veterinary therapeutic
use.
Consideration.
It was resolved by the Board of Directors of the registrant
that as consideration for agreeing to serve as an officer and director of Regen Biopharma, Inc. David R. Koos shall be awarded
10,000 shares of a newly designated series of nonconvertible supervoting Preferred Stock (“Supervoting Stock”). With
respect to each matter submitted to a vote of stockholders of the Corporation, each holder of Supervoting Stock shall be entitled
to cast that number of votes which is equivalent to the number of shares of Supervoting Stock owned by such holder times five hundred
thousand.
Departure of Officer and Director:
On March 23, 2021 Todd S. Caven resigned from his position
as Chairman of the Board of Directors, Chief Executive Officer and any and all other offices he may hold of Regen BioPharma ,Inc.
and KCL Therapeutics Inc. As of March 23, 2021 David R. Koos became the sole officer and director of both the registrant and KCL
Therapeutics, Inc.