Report of Foreign Issuer (6-k)
July 20 2018 - 4:14PM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington, D.C. 20549
FORM 6-K
REPORT OF FOREIGN PRIVATE ISSUER
PURSUANT TO RULE 13a-16 OR 15d-16 UNDER
THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934
For the month of July 2018.
Commission File Number: 001-38252
Spark
Networks SE
(Translation of registrant's name into English)
Kohlfurter Straße 41/43
Berlin 10999
Germany
(Address of principal executive offices)
Indicate by check mark whether the registrant files or will
file annual reports under cover Form 20-F or Form 40-F.
Form 20-F
x
Form 40-F
¨
Indicate by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form
6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(1):________________
Indicate by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form
6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(7):________________
As previously announced, on June 5, 2018 at the Annual General
Meeting of Spark Networks, SE (the “Company”), the Company’s stockholders elected Cheryl Law and Hermione McKee
to the Company’s Administrative Board (the “Board”).
At a meeting of the Board on July 18, 2018, the Board approved
changes to the composition of its committees as follows: (i) Hermione McKee became a member of the Audit Committee, (ii) Brad Goldberg
resigned as a member of the Audit committee, (iii) Cheryl Law became a member of the Presiding and Nominating Committee, and (iv) David
Khalil resigned as a member of the Presiding and Nominating Committee. Following such changes, the composition of each of the Board’s
Audit Committee and Presiding and Nominating Committee is as follows: (i) Colleen Birdnow Brown serves as Chair of the Audit
Committee, and Axel Hefer and Hermione McKee serve as members of the Audit Committee; and (ii) Brad Goldberg serves as Chair of
the Presiding and Nominating Committee, and Colleen Birdnow Brown and Cheryl Law serve as members of the Presiding and Nominating
Committee.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities
Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
|
SPARK NETWORKS SE
|
|
|
|
|
|
Date: July 20, 2018
|
By:
|
/s/ Robert O’Hare
|
|
|
|
Name: Robert O’Hare
|
|
|
|
Title: Chief Financial Officer
|
|
Spark Networks (AMEX:LOV)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Spark Networks (AMEX:LOV)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024