Current Report Filing (8-k)
June 14 2017 - 7:30AM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED
STATES
SECURITIES
AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington,
D.C. 20549
FORM
8-K
CURRENT
REPORT
PURSUANT
TO SECTION 13 OR 15(d) OF
THE
SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934
Date
of Report (Date of earliest event reported):
June 14, 2017
Bosy
Holdings Corp
(Exact
name of Registrant as specified in its charter)
NEVADA
|
|
333-208978
|
|
98-1253258
|
(State
or other jurisdiction
of Incorporation)
|
|
(Commission
File Number)
|
|
(IRS
Employer
Identification Number)
|
Unit
Room 7C, World Trust Tower Building,
50
Stanley Street, Central, Hong Kong
(Address
of principal executive offices, zip code)
Tel:
(852) 3610-2665
(Registrant’s
telephone number, including area code)
Check
the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the Company under
any of the following provisions:
[ ]
Written communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
[ ]
Soliciting material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12)
[ ]
Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
[ ]
Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
ITEM
5.02. DEPARTURE OF DIRECTORS OR PRINCIPAL OFFICERS; ELECTION OF DIRECTORS; APPOINTMENT OF PRINCIPAL OFFICERS
As
of June 14, 2017, Mr. Ong Kean Wah resigned from the position with the Company, including that of Chief Operations Officer
of
the Company
. The resignation was not the result of any disagreement with the Company on any matter relating to the
Company’s operations, policies or practices. Mr. Ong Kean Wah has been the Chief Operations Officer
of
the Company
since September 18, 2015.
As
of June 14, 2017, Ms. Chen Yan Hong resigned from the position of the Director of the Company. The resignation was not the result
of any disagreement with the Company on any matter relating to the Company’s operations, policies or practices. Ms. Chen
Yan Hong has been the Director of the Company since June 23, 2015.
SIGNATURE
Pursuant
to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended, the Company has duly caused this report to be signed on
its behalf by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
|
Bosy
Holdings Corp.
|
|
|
|
Date:
June 14, 2017
|
By:
|
/
s/
TEOH KOOI SOOI
|
|
|
TEOH
Kooi Sooi
|
|
|
Chief
Executive Officer, President, Treasurer, Director
|
|
|
(Principal
Executive Officer, Principal Financial Officer, Principal Accounting Officer)
|
|
|
|
Date:
June 14, 2017
|
By:
|
/
s/
CHEN ZHERU
|
|
|
CHEN
Zheru
|
|
|
Director,
Secretary
|
United Royale (CE) (USOTC:URYL)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
United Royale (CE) (USOTC:URYL)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024