Current Report Filing (8-k)
April 03 2015 - 11:14AM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington, D.C. 20549
____________________
FORM 8-K
Pursuant to Section 13 or 15(d) of the
Securities Exchange Act of 1934
Date of report (Date of earliest event reported):
March 30, 2015
____________________
WPCS
INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED
(Exact name of registrant as specified in
its charter)
Delaware |
|
001-34643 |
|
98-0204758 |
(State or Other Jurisdiction |
|
(Commission File Number) |
|
(IRS Employer |
Of Incorporation) |
|
|
|
Identification No.) |
521 Railroad Avenue
Suisun City, California 94585
(Address of principal executive offices
and zip code)
Registrant’s telephone number, including
area code: (707) 421-1300
(Former Name or Former Address if Changed Since Last
Report)
Check
the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant
under any of the following provisions (see General Instruction A.2. below):
| o | Written communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the
Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425) |
| o | Soliciting material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the
Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12) |
| o | Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b)
under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b)) |
| o | Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c)
under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c)) |
| Item 5.02 | Departure of Directors or Principal Officers; Election
of Directors; Appointment of Principal Officers. |
As part of an ongoing corporate restructuring,
the Board of Directors (the “Board”) of WPCS International Incorporated (the “Company”) decided to decrease
the size of the Board from six directors to four directors. Accordingly, Neil Hebenton resigned from the Board on March 30, 2015.
Mr. Hebenton expressed no disagreements with the Company at the time of his resignation. The Company had previously announced the
resignation of Kevin Coyle from the Board in a Current Report on Form 8-K filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission on
March 26, 2015. Following these resignations, the Board reduced the size of the Board to four directors.
At the time of their resignations, Mr.
Coyle served as the Chairman of the Audit Committee of the Board (the “Audit Committee”), and Mr. Hebenton served as
the Chairman of the Nominating Committee of the Board (the “Nominating Committee”). Effective as of March 30, 2015,
Charles Benton was appointed the Chairman of the Audit Committee, Norm Dumbroff was appointed the Chairman of the Nominating Committee,
and Edward Gildea was appointed the Chairman of the Executive Committee of the Board, replacing Mr. Benton.
SIGNATURE
Pursuant to the requirement
of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned
thereunto duly authorized.
|
WPCS INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Date: April 3, 2015 |
By: |
/s/ Sebastian Giordano |
|
|
Name: |
Sebastian Giordano |
|
|
Title: |
Interim Chief Executive Officer |
|
DropCar (NASDAQ:DCAR)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
DropCar (NASDAQ:DCAR)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024