UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington, D.C. 20549
FORM 8-K
CURRENT REPORT
Pursuant to Section 13 or 15(d) of The Securities
Exchange Act of 1934
November 30, 2013
Date of Report (Date of earliest event reported)
MODERN MOBILITY AIDS, INC.
(Exact name of registrant as specified in
its charter)
Nevada |
333-168983 |
27-4677038 |
(State or other jurisdiction |
(Commission |
(IRS Employer |
of incorporation) |
File Number) |
Identification No.) |
18-7001 Steeles Ave West
Toronto, Ontario M9W
0A2
Attn: Declan French
(Address of Principal Executive offices)(Zip
Code)
(586) 530-5605
(Registrant’s telephone number Including
area code)
(Former name or former address, if changed
since last report)
Check the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended
to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant under any of the following provisions (see General Instruction
A.2. below):
¨ Written
communication pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
¨ Soliciting
material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12)
¨ Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
¨ Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
ITEM 4.01 CHANGES IN REGISTRANT’S CERTIFYING ACCOUNTANT.
(a) On November 30, 2013, the RONALD R. CHADWICK, P.C. (“RRC”)
the Company’s independent certified public accountants resigned due to the retirement of the accountant who performed virtually
all of the services to the Company.
The report of RRC on the Company’s financial statements
for its fiscal years ended June 30, 2012 and 2011 indicated conditions which raised substantial doubt about the Company’s
ability to continue as a going concern. Except as set forth in the preceding sentence, the report of RRC on the Company’s
financial statements for its fiscal years ended June 30, 2010 and 2011 did not contain an adverse opinion or a disclaimer of opinion
nor was it qualified or modified as to uncertainty, audit scope, or accounting principles. During the Company’s fiscal years
ended June 30, 2010 and 2011 and the subsequent interim periods preceding the termination, there were no disagreements with RRC
on any matter of accounting principles or practices, financial statement disclosure, or auditing scope or procedure, which disagreement,
if not resolved to the satisfaction of RRC would have caused RRC to make reference to the subject matter of the disagreements in
connection with its report on the financial statements for such years or subsequent interim periods.
The Company requested that RRC furnish it with a letter addressed
to the Securities and Exchange Commission (“SEC”) stating whether or not it agrees with the Company’s statements
in this Item 4.01. A copy of the letter furnished by RRC in response to that request, dated March 10, 2014, is filed as Exhibit
16.1 to this Form 8-K.
(b) Effective February 26th 2014, Cutler & Co.,
LLC (“Cutler”), was engaged as the Company’s new independent certified accounting firm. During the two most recent
fiscal years and the interim period preceding the engagement of Cutler, the Company has not consulted with Cutler regarding either:
(i) the application of accounting principles to a specified transaction, either completed or proposed, or the type of audit opinion
that might be rendered on the Company’s financial statements; or (ii) any matter that was either the subject of a disagreement
or event identified in paragraph (a)(1)(iv) of Item 304 of Regulation S-K. The decision to retain Cutler was approved by the Board
of Directors of the Company.
Item 5.02 Departure of Directors or Principal
Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Principal Officers
Appointment of Directors
Effective January 4, 2014, our Board of Directors increased
the number of members who serve on the Board of Directors to three persons and appointed Samuel Hill as a member of our Board of
Directors as well as the Company’s Chief Executive Officer, President, Chief Financial Officer, Treasurer and Secretary.
Effective January 6, 2014, Jeffrey W. Leuchter, our director and Ruy Cabrera our director and former Chief Executive Officer, President,
Chief Financial Officer, Treasurer and Secretary each resigned as a director of the Company. As of such date, Mr. Hill was our
sole director and executive officer. Mr. Hill has no family relationships with any executive officers or directors of the Company
or persons nominated or chosen by the Company to become directors or officers. There is no arrangement or understanding pursuant
to which Mr. Hill was appointed a member of the Board of Directors nor is the Company aware of any transaction requiring disclosure
under Item 404(a) of Regulation S-K with respect to Mr. Hill.
On February 10, 2014, our Board of Directors appointed Declan
French as a member of our Board of Directors. Mr. French has no family relationships with any executive officers or directors of
the Company or persons nominated or chosen by the Company to become directors or officers. There is no arrangement or understanding
pursuant to which Mr. French was appointed a member of the Board of Directors nor is the Company aware of any transaction requiring
disclosure under Item 404(a) of Regulation S-K with respect to Mr. French.
Effective February 24, 2014, Samuel Hill our director and former
Chief Executive Officer, President, Chief Financial Officer, Treasurer and Secretary resigned from such positions. On February
24, 2014, our Board of Directors appointed Preston Shea as a member of the Board as well as our President. The Board also appointed
another of its members Declan French as it Chief Executive Officer, Chief Financial Officer, Treasurer and Secretary. Mr. Shea
has no family relationships with any executive officers or directors of the Company or persons nominated or chosen by the Company
to become directors or officers. There is no arrangement or understanding pursuant to which Mr. Shea was appointed a member of
the Board of Directors nor is the Company aware of any transaction requiring disclosure under Item 404(a) of Regulation S-K with
respect to Mr. Shea.
Resume of Declan French
Mr. French currently serves as the Chief Executive Officer for
E-World and is responsible for managing the day-to-day operations and strategic direction of the firm. Prior to E-World, Mr. French
held the role of Managing Director at Goldbear Capital, a boutique mergers and acquisitions firm that focused on raising capital
for growing companies through private placements and public offerings. From 2009 to 2011, Mr. French served as the Vice President
of Business Development for Foundation Markets, a Toronto-based investment bank where he raised private capital for start-up mining
companies. Prior to this, he was the founder, Chairman, and CEO of Thinkpath Engineering Services (formerly IT Staffing Ltd.) and
grew it to $45 million in revenue. While running Thinkpath, he completed an IPO and raised $30 million in capital through PIPEs.
In 2008, Thinkpath Inc filed for bankruptcy and was subsequently sold to a third-party. Mr. French has also served as President
for various companies including Toronto Executive Consultants, TEC Partners, Torex Computers, and Euro Terminals. Mr. French attended
the University of St. Thomas where he studied Philosophy and Psychology.
Resume of Preston Shea
Mr. Preston Shea’s a member of the E-World Board of Directors,
Mr. Shea has decades of expertise in the areas of business law and government regulations. Mr. Shea currently serves as a Senior
Vice President of Sakha Enterprises Corp. Prior to this, Mr. Shea was the President and Secretary of Studio One Media and also
served as its Chief Executive Officer. Mr. Shea practiced international immigration law and business law in Ontario, Canada, Detroit,
Michigan and Phoenix, Arizona, with an emphasis on the North American Free Trade Agreement. Prior to that, he was employed by the
government of Canada in various positions including Chief of Staff for the Federal Minister of the Environment, Special Assistant
to the Federal Minister of International Trade, and as a Senior Investment Advisor in the Los Angeles offices of the Canadian Consulate.
Mr. Shea is licensed as an Attorney in the State of Arizona and as a Barrister and Solicitor by the Law Society of Upper Canada
in Ontario. He holds B.A., M.B.A. and an L.L.B.
Item 9.01 Financial Statements and Exhibits
| 16.1 | Letter from Accountant. |
Signatures
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities
Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
|
|
|
|
|
MODERN MOBILITY AIDS, INC. |
Date: March 10, 2014 |
|
(Registrant) |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
/s/ Declan French |
|
Declan French, Chief Executive Officer |
Modern Mobility Aids (PK) (USOTC:MDRM)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Modern Mobility Aids (PK) (USOTC:MDRM)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024