Report of Foreign Issuer (6-k)
March 31 2020 - 11:49AM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
WASHINGTON, DC 20549
FORM 6-K
REPORT OF FOREIGN PRIVATE ISSUER
PURSUANT TO RULE 13a-16 OR 15d-16 UNDER
THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934
For the Month of March 2020
Commission File No.: 001-37678
SPI ENERGY
CO., LTD.
Suite 2703, 27/F, China Resources Building
26 Harbour Road, Wan Chai
Hong Kong SAR, China
(Address of Principal Executive Offices.)
Indicate by check mark whether the registrant files or will
file annual reports under cover Form 20-F or Form 40-F.
Form 20-F ☒ Form
40-F ☐
Indicate by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form
6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(1): ☐
Indicate by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form
6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(7): ☐
Changes to Board of Directors
On March 28, 2020, Mr. Zhou Lang resigned
as a director of SPI Energy Co., Ltd. (the “Company”), effective immediately. Mr. Zhou Lang has been engaged by the
Company as a technology consultant to advise the Company on its solar business.
On March 30, 2020, Mr. Zhang Jing
was appointed by the board of directors of the Company to replace Mr. Zhou Lang as the Company’s director, effective
immediately.
Mr. Zhang Jing has served as a director
of Hong Kong Dongying Financial Group since 2012, where he manages the group’s private equity operations since 2012. Mr.
Zhang has also been an independent director of New City Construction Development Group Co., Ltd. and China International Capital
Corporation since 2012. Mr. Zhang served as a deputy general manager of China Yituo Group Co., Ltd., and a director and chief financial
officer of First Tractor Co., Ltd. from 1997 to 2007. Mr. Zhang received a Master degree in Management Engineering from Jiangsu
University.
Financial Statements and Exhibits.
SIGNATURE
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities
Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned, thereunto duly
authorized.
Dated: March 31, 2020
SPI ENERGY CO., LTD.
By: /s/ Xiaofeng Peng
Name: Xiaofeng Peng
Title: Chief Executive Officer
SPI Energy (NASDAQ:SPI)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
SPI Energy (NASDAQ:SPI)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024