Current Report Filing (8-k)
February 12 2019 - 6:16AM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED
STATES
SECURITIES
AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
WASHINGTON,
D.C. 20549
FORM
8-K
CURRENT
REPORT
Pursuant
to Section 13 or 15(d) of the
Securities
Exchange Act of 1934
Date
of report (Date of earliest event reported): February 11, 2019
DBUB
GROUP, INC.
(Exact
name of registrant as specified in Charter)
Nevada
|
|
000-28767
|
|
88-0403070
|
(State
or other jurisdiction of
incorporation
or organization)
|
|
(Commission
File No.)
|
|
(IRS
Employee Identification No.)
|
No.
108 ShangCheng Road, Suite 1-1003
Pudong
New District, Shanghai, China 200120
(Address
of Principal Executive Offices)
+086-156-18521412
(Registrant’s
Telephone number)
Copies
to:
Asher
S. Levitsky PC
Ellenoff
Grossman & Schole LLP
1345
Avenue of the Americas; Suite 1100
New
York, New York 10105-0302
Phone:
(212) 370-1300
Fax:
(212) 370-7889
E-mail:
alevitsky@egsllp.com
Check
the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant
under any of the following provisions (see General Instruction A.2. below):
☐
Written communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
☐
Soliciting material pursuant to Rule 14a-12(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12(b))
☐
Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
☐
Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
Item
5.02. Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements
of Certain Officers.
On
January 30, 2019:
|
i.
|
Hong
Yang, resigned as a director and chairman of the board.
|
|
ii.
|
Zinan
Zhou, the Company’s chief executive officer, was appointed as chairman of the board.
|
|
iii.
|
Shu
Yu Poon, the Company’s secretary, was appointed as head of marketing.
|
|
iv.
|
Lihui
Wang was appointed as a director and chief operating officer.
|
Mr.
Wang, age 48, has 12 years of experience in business development, solution architecting and project management in the domain of
information technology and information systems. He had led and managed eight Singapore government IT projects. From 2013, when
Mr. Wang founded Weebo Pte Ltd., a distributor of cloud based POS system products in high-end retails, service and food and beverage
sectors, until February 1, 2019, Mr. Wang was a managing director at Weebo. Mr. Wang remains a director or Weebo.
Ms.
Yang did not resign because of a disagreement on any matter relating to the Company’s operations, policies or practices.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant
to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the Registrant has duly caused this Report to be signed on its behalf
by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
Date:
February 11, 2019
|
DBUB
Group, Inc.
|
|
|
By:
|
/s/ Zinan Zhou
|
|
Zinan Zhou
|
|
Chief Executive Officer
|