EXECUTIVE OFFICERS
The following table sets forth information regarding our executive officers as of April 15, 2017:
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Name
|
|
Age
|
|
Position
|
Amarpreet Sawhney, Ph.D.
|
|
50
|
|
President and Chief Executive Officer and Chairman of the Board of Directors
|
George Migausky
|
|
62
|
|
Interim Chief Financial Officer
|
James Fortune
|
|
58
|
|
Chief Operating Officer
|
Eric Ankerud
|
|
60
|
|
Executive Vice President, Regulatory, Quality and Compliance
|
Andrew Hurley
|
|
48
|
|
Chief Commercial Officer
|
Jonathan Talamo, M.D.
|
|
56
|
|
Chief Medical Officer
|
In addition to the biographical information for Dr. Sawhney, which is set forth above under “Corporate Governance—Board of Directors—Members of Our Board of Directors,” set forth below is certain biographical information about Mr. Migausky, Mr. Fortune, Mr. Ankerud, Mr. Hurley and Dr. Talamo:
George Migausky
has served as our interim Chief Financial Officer since April 6, 2017. Mr. Migausky previously served as Executive Vice President and Chief Financial Officer of Dyax Corp., a publicly-traded biopharmaceutical company focused on the discovery, development, and commercialization of biotherapeutics for rare diseases, from August 2008 until March 2016. Prior to joining Dyax, he served as Chief Financial Officer of Wellstat Management Company, a privately-held company responsible for the strategy, business development and operations of an affiliated group of five life science companies. Mr. Migausky received a B.S. in Accounting from Boston College and an M.B.A. from Babson College.
James Fortune
has served as our Chief Operating Officer since 2008. Following the resignation of W. Bradford Smith, our Chief Financial Officer, effective March 31, 2017, Mr. Fortune served as our interim Principal Financial Officer and our Principal Accounting Officer, from April 1, 2017 to April 6, 2017. Mr. Fortune also served as the Chief Operating Officer of Augmenix, Inc. from 2008 to April 2014 and of AccessClosure, Inc. from 2008 to 2010. Prior to joining Ocular Therapeutix, Mr. Fortune served as the Chief Operating Officer of Intrinsic Therapeutics, Inc. and the Chief Operating Officer of Confluent Surgical, Inc. Previously, he held various senior management roles with the orthopedic and neurosurgical divisions of Johnson & Johnson. Mr. Fortune holds a B.S. in Mechanical Engineering from Rensselaer Polytechnic Institute.
Eric Ankerud
has served as our Executive Vice President, Regulatory, Quality and Compliance, since February 2016. Previously, Mr. Ankerud served as our Executive Vice President, Clinical, Regulatory and Quality from 2007 to January 2016. From 2008 to April 2014, Mr. Ankerud also served as Executive Vice President, Clinical, Regulatory and Quality, of Augmenix, Inc. Prior to joining Ocular Therapeutix, Mr. Ankerud served as the Vice President, Clinical, Regulatory and Quality, of Confluent Surgical, Inc., the Vice President, Corporate Regulatory Affairs, of Boston Scientific Corporation, the Vice President, Quality, Regulatory and Clinical Affairs, of Summit Technology, Inc., a medical device company, and the Director, Corporate Regulatory Affairs, of Bausch & Lomb. Previously, he held various senior management roles with the surgical products and infusion pump divisions of C.R. Bard, a medical device manufacturer. Mr. Ankerud holds a B.A. in Economics from St. Lawrence University and a J.D. from the State University of New York at Buffalo.
Andrew Hurley
has served as our Chief Commercial Officer since October 2016. Previously, Mr. Hurley served as Vice President, Sales and Marketing of Dyax Corp. from October 2014 to May 2016. Mr. Hurley also served as a Principal at Capgemini Consulting, a global, management consulting firm, from 2013 to September 2014, and as Vice President of Marketing and Commercial Operations of Sunovion Pharmaceuticals, a formerly publicly-traded pharmaceutical company, from 2008 to December 2012. Mr. Hurley earned a B.S. degree in Consumer Studies at the University of Vermont and pursued graduate-level coursework in Marketing and Finance at Bentley University.
Jonathan Talamo, M.D.
has served as our Chief Medical Officer since July 2016. Previously, Dr. Talamo served as a Program Committee Chairman at the New England Ophthalmological Society, from 2015 to 2016, and as Medical Director of Surgisite Boston, LLC, from 2011 to 2014. Dr. Talamo also served as a member of the boards of directors of Surgistic Boston, LLC, from 2005 to 2016, and of New the New England Ophthalmological Society from 2015 to 2016. Dr. Talamo received his M.D. degree from The Johns Hopkins University School of Medicine and completed an ophthalmology residency at the Wilmer Ophthalmological Institute at Johns Hopkins. He also completed a clinical fellowship in cornea and external disease at Massachusetts Eye and Ear Infirmary.
Our executive officers are elected by, and serve at the discretion of, our board of directors. There are no family relationships among any of our directors or executive officers, except between Dr. Sawhney and Mr. Chadha, who are cousins.