Current Report Filing (8-k)
April 23 2015 - 4:25PM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED
STATES
SECURITIES
AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington,
D.C. 20549
FORM
8-K
CURRENT
REPORT
Pursuant
to Section 13 or 15(d) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934
Date
of Report (Date of earliest event reported): April 17, 2015
VAPOR
CORP.
(Exact
name of registrant as specified in its charter)
Delaware |
|
001-36469 |
|
84-1070932 |
(State
or Other Jurisdiction |
|
(Commission |
|
(I.R.S.
Employer |
of
Incorporation) |
|
File
Number) |
|
Identification
No.) |
3001
Griffin Road
Dania
Beach, Florida 33312
(Address
of Principal Executive Office) (Zip Code)
(888)
766-5351
(Registrant’s
telephone number, including area code)
Check
the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant
under any of the following provisions:
[ ] Written
communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
[ ] Soliciting
material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12)
[ ] Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
[ ] Pre-commencement
communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
Item
5.02 Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements
of Certain Officers.
On
April 17, 2015, Robert Swayman resigned as a director of Vapor Corp. (the “Company”) as a result of his ceasing to
be independent. Mr. Swayman is now providing business operations consulting services to the Company. Mr. Swayman’s decision
to resign was not due to any disagreement with the Company relating to the Company’s operations, policies or practices.
On
April 18, 2015, the Company appointed Mr. Daniel MacLachlan as a director replacing Mr. Swayman. Mr. MacLachlan served as the
Chief Financial Officer of The Best One, Inc., from October 2014 through early February 2015, facilitating its merger with Tiger
Media, Inc. (NYSE MKT: IDI). Mr. MacLachlan served as Director of Finance and Chief Financial Officer for TransUnion Risk and
Alternative Data Solutions, Inc., after it acquired substantially all the assets of TLO, LLC (“TLO”), a leading provider
of data fusion technology-driven investigative products and solutions, in December 2013. Mr. MacLachlan was Chief Financial Officer
of TLO since its inception in 2009. Mr. MacLachlan was also appointed to the Audit Committee, the Compensation Committee and the
Corporate Governance and Nominating Committee of the Company as an independent director in conformity with the Nasdaq Stock Market
Rules.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant
to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf
by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
|
VAPOR
CORP. |
|
|
|
Date:
April 23, 2015 |
By:
|
/s/
James Martin |
|
Name: |
James
Martin |
|
Title: |
Chief
Financial Officer |
Healthier Choices Manage... (PK) (USOTC:HCMC)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Healthier Choices Manage... (PK) (USOTC:HCMC)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024