Report of Foreign Issuer (6-k)
February 12 2015 - 2:33PM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington, DC 20549
Form 6-K
REPORT OF FOREIGN ISSUER PURSUANT TO RULE 13a-16 OR 15d-16 UNDER THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934
For the month of: February 2015
|
Commission File Number: 001-35393
|
(Name of registrant)
570 Granville Street, Suite 1600
Vancouver, British Columbia
Canada V6C 3P1
(Address of Principal Executive Offices)
Indicate by check mark whether the registrant files or will file annual reports under cover of Form 20-F or Form 40-F:
Form 20-F £ Form 40-F R
Indicate by check mark if the registrant is submitting the Form 6-K in paper as permitted by Regulation S-T Rule 101(b)(1):
Exhibit Index
Exhibit
Number
|
Description of Exhibit
|
|
|
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned, thereunto duly authorized.
Date: February 12, 2015
|
PRETIUM RESOURCES INC.
|
|
|
By:
|
/s/ Joseph J. Ovsenek
|
|
|
|
Name:
|
Joseph J. Ovsenek
|
|
|
|
Title:
|
Executive Vice President, Chief Development Officer
|
|
EXHIBIT 99.1
Form 51-102F3
Material Change Report
Item 1
|
Name and Address of Company
Pretium Resources Inc. (“Pretivm”)
Suite 1600, 570 Granville Street
Vancouver, BC
V6C 3P1
|
Item 2
|
Date of Material Change
January 14, 2015
|
Item 3
|
News Release
The news releases dated January 14, 2015 were disseminated through Marketwire and filed on SEDAR.
|
Item 4
|
Summary of Material Change
On January 14, 2015, Pretivm announced that it had appointed Tom S.Q. Yip as Chief Financial Officer, effective January 26, 2015.
|
Item 5
|
Full Description of Material Change
|
|
5.1 Full Description of Material Change
On January 14, 2015, Pretivm announced that it had appointed Tom S.Q. Yip as Chief Financial Officer effective January 26, 2015.
Mr. Yip has over 25 years of financial management experience in the mining industry for exploration and development companies and producers. Most recently he was Chief Financial Officer for International Tower Hill Mines Ltd. At his prior position as CFO of Silver Standard Resources Inc. he was a key member of the leadership team which transitioned the company from exploration and development to production. He began his mining career at Echo Bay Mines Ltd. before the company merged with Kinross Gold Corporation. Mr. Yip is a Chartered Accountant and holds a Bachelor of Commerce degree in Business Administration from the University of Alberta.
Mr. Yip has been an independent director of Pretivm’s Board of Directors since 2011 and will continue in his role on the Board as a non-independent director.
|
|
5.2 Disclosure for Restructuring Transactions
Not applicable.
|
Item 6
|
Reliance on subsection 7.1(2) or (3) of National Instrument 51-102
Not applicable.
|
Item 7
|
Omitted Information
Not applicable.
|
Item 8
|
Executive Officer
Joseph Ovsenek
Chief Development Officer & Executive Vice President
Phone: 604-558-1784
|
Item 9
|
Date of Report
Dated at Vancouver, BC, this 28th day of January, 2015.
|
2
Pretium Resources (NYSE:PVG)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Pretium Resources (NYSE:PVG)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024