Item
5.02 Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements
of Certain Officers
Resignation
of Board Members
Mr.
Thomas Williams and Mr. James Kylstad notified us that they would be resigning as members of our Board effective April 2, 2020
and April 3, 2020, respectively. Neither Mr. Williams nor Mr. Kylstad had any disagreements with Two Rivers.
Appointment
and Election of Board Members
At
a Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Board meeting on April 23, 2020, Mr. Oscar Tapia Pereira and Mr. Ramon Chimelis were
appointed by unanimous consent to the Company’s board to serve until the next annual meeting of shareholders and Mr. Tapia
Pereira and Mr. Chimelis accepted their appointments.
About
Mr.Tapia Pereira., age 40:
Mr.
Oscar Tapia Pereira is an Attorney at Law with more than eighteen (18) years of practice, with emphasis in matters related with
Securities Law, Regulation and Commercial and Corporate Law. Additionally, Mr. Tapia Pereira has ten (10) years of experience
as Financial Analyst, Financial Principal and Compliance Officer, currently acting as Principal Executive in BVAI a Registered
Investment Advisor in the Republic of Panama.
In
his experience as a lawyer he served as Chief of the Legal Department of the National Public Services Authority in the Republic
of Panama, and supported multinationals as legal consultant. Mr. Tapia Pereira is fluent in English and Portuguese and works as
consultant and investment advisor in over 15 countries in Europe, USA, South America. Currently he is advisor to the Board of
Directors of Kraftpal Technologies in Europe.
Mr.
Tapia Pereira has a Master Degree in Procedural Law with the University of Panama, Specialization on Telecommunications Regulation
with the University of Brasilia - (UnB.), Brazil; Specialization in Corporate and Business Law with the University of San Francisco
(USF), USA; and, ISO - Internal Quality Systems Auditor with Société Générale de Surveillance –
(SGS) – Switzerland.
About
Mr. Chimelis, age 54:
Mr.
Ramon Chimelis has over 20 years of experience in the financial markets. He has held fiduciary responsibilities in several startups
and as vice president of Palletkraft, N.A. During this time his responsibilities included strategic planning, operations and financial
planning.
He
has successfully raised many millions in capital for green companies to high-tech startups in the artificial intelligence space.
Through hands on experience and a strong work ethic, he has learned the nuances of bring successful ventures to market.
Mr.
Chimelis spent his early career working on wall street as an analyst for technology offerings working at boutique firms in New
York and Florida. He has spent the last three years working within the industrial hemp markets, graphene scientists and innovators
helping to build on this new emerging platform for material science.
Mr.
Ramon Chimelis founded and serves as Principal Executive Officer and Principal Financial Officer at Big Sky Industries II, III,
VI, V and VI Inc. and has served as their President, Secretary and Treasurer since January 2000. From January 2000 to June 2003,
he served as an Officer and Director of Design Pallets, Inc. Mr. Chimelis served as the Chief Executive Officer, President, Treasurer
and Secretary of Coffee Exchange, Inc. from January 2000 to November 20, 2007.
From
1999 to January 2000, Mr. Chimelis was engaged in day trading through Gunslinger Group, Inc. From 1998 to 1999, he served as a
Trader at the broker dealer firm of JOQ Financial, Inc., and from 1995 to 1998, he served as a Stock Broker at Collner Higgins
and Higgins and Anderson. Since 2003, Mr. Chimelis continues to day trade as self-employed.
Mr.
Chimelis studied Business Finance at Brevard Community College.