|
Item 5.02
|
Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements of Certain Officers
|
On February 2, 2019, Mr. Vinu Patel was appointed
as Interim President of Toron, Inc. due to the resignation of Mr. Rene Morentin.
On April 3, 2019, Mr. Vinu Patel resigned as Interim
President and appointed Mr. Giovanni Melchiorre as Interim Secretary and himself as Interim Vice President.
On April 5, 2019, Mr. Massimo Meneghello was appointed
President and director.
On August 12, 2019, a majority of shareholders
who own over 30% of the common stock of Toron, Inc. held an emergency meeting of the shareholders to appoint new management and
replace temporary board members placed during Toron’s transition into the Tele-Communications business.
The majority shareholders terminated the Board
and Officer positions of Mr. Giovanni Melchiorre and Mr. Vinu Patel and appointed Renato Goncalves Dos Anjos Executive Vice President
and Renato de Capos Gloria Braga as Secretary/Treasurer and Chief Financial Officer and Director.
The Biographical Information for the new Officers
and Directors is as follows:
Massimo Meneghello, age 61, President and
Director
From 2016 until April 2019 , Mr. Meneghello
was Manager Director of Dilbert International LTD, a UK Holding company, which owns assets and shares of stock in other corporations,
limited liability companies, limited partnerships, private equity funds, hedge funds, publicly traded stocks, bonds, real estate,
song rights, brand names, patents, trademarks, copyrights, real estate.
From 2007 until 2010, Mr. Meneghello was co-partner
of a group of companies, including Business Consulting & Telecommunication s.r.l and Radiant Limited Ltd.
He was a Founder and President of Web Opportunity
s.r.l., (1996-2007) one of the first Italian provider of internet services. Mr. Meneghello was a Founder and President of International
Telecom s.r.l. between 1983-1995.
Mr. Meneghello attended school at Liceo Scientifico
Fracastoro in Verona, Italy and graduated in June 1976. He also attended University of Bologna, studying International Corporate
and Administrative Law from 1976 until 1983.
Renato Goncalves Dos Anjos, age 37, Executive
Vice President
Mr. Goncalves Dos Anjos has been Executive
Vice President of Vox Telecomunicacoes do Brasil Ltda since December 2018. He is also currently President of Telus iP Telecommunications
(since 2010). From 2014-2017, he was Chief Executive Officer of America North Telecommunication Corp. From 2012-2014, he was Partner
President of Telvix Telecommunications and Services. Mr. Goncalves dos Anjos also has experience as Network and Telecommunications
Infrastructure Administrator with the Brazilian Army during 2010-2017.
Mr. Goncalves Dos Anjos attended the National
Institute of Telecommunications between 2003-2008 where he completed INATEL Postgraduate – Telecommunications.
Renato de Capos Gloria Braga, age 56, Secretary/Treasurer
and Chief Financial Officer and Director
Mr. De Capos Gloria Braga at 1984 attended
the University Ensino Medio – Financial ,Guanhaes where he completed , MG –
From 2016 to 2019 Managing Director of
UUDI Servicio di Technologia LTD in Vittoria Brazil. From 2013 to 2016 Vice president at RB System Development LTD ( Brazil
). From 1997 to 2013 Co-Founder and Owner of RCGB Emprendimento Imobiliario – Construction – LTD -Brazil. From
1992 to 1997 Suppling Nature’s Food company and vast majority of Health food and Vitamin stores New York and New
Jersey states U.S.A.