Directorate Change
March 01 2002 - 2:00AM
UK Regulatory
RNS Number:2333S
Andrews Sykes Group PLC
1 March 2002
1 March 2002
ANDREWS SYKES GROUP PLC ("Andrews Sykes")
Retirement of Director
As indicated in the interim results for the six months ended 30 June 2001, John
Hall retired on 28 February 2002 as Operations Director of Andrews Sykes.
Further details of the resulting changes in the group's management structure
will be included in the year end annual report.
This information is provided by RNS
The company news service from the London Stock Exchange
Andrews Sykes (LSE:ASY)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Andrews Sykes (LSE:ASY)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024